Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers - Referrals
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Astle, Benson, Currie, Guzzone, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting referral of a patient to a certifying provider by certain persons or entities.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1035
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {887774/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-2)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers - Referrals
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {887774/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers - Referrals
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (130-2) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Text - Chapter - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers - Referrals
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page