Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senator Raskin (Chair, Workgroup to Conduct a Review of Disclosure Requirements of the Public Ethics Laws) and Senators Ferguson and Simonaire
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Ethics Commission to adopt specified model ethics provisions for school boards; providing that a model provision may be adopted by or imposed on a school board under specified circumstances; repealing a requirement that a regulated lobbyist attend a training course within a specified time period; altering the information related to employment and sources of earned income that a member of the General Assembly is required to report to the Joint Ethics Committee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1397
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {374837/1
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Kelley) Rejected (6-33)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Raskin) Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Referred Senate Rules 47
Senate 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2013 3/21/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {374837/1 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Kelley) Rejected (6-33) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 66
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-205, 15-513, 15-607, 15-716, 15-717, 15-808, 15-816 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM