Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and Update
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Feldman, King, Lee, Madaleno, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified Maryland Department of Transportation business entities to review and update the I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and the West Side Mobility Study in order to ensure compliance with federal and State project development process requirements for the approval and funding of major public transportation projects; and requiring that a specified report be submitted on or before January 1 each year to specified committees until the completion of the review and update.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1050
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and Update
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM