Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "unfair or deceptive trade practice" to be "unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice"; providing that the purpose of the Act is to support enforcement by and funding of the Office of the Attorney General and the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to protect State residents when conducting financial transactions and receiving financial services; requiring the Commissioner to designate a Student Loan Ombudsman; requiring the establishment of a student loan borrower education course; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1634
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018, January 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {717373/1
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {717373/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933193/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-42)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {717373/1 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable with Amendments {717373/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Senate 3/21/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-12) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {933193/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Waldstreicher) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (89-42) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-12) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Text - Chapter - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
(   7-101, 7-205 )
(   12-101, 12-101.1, 12-111, 12-112, 12-114, 12-114.1, 12-301, 12-303, 12-311, 12-313, 12-314, 12-401, 12-402.1, 12-601, 13-101, 13-301, 13-303, 13-410, 14-1212.1, 14-1212.2, 14-1212.3, 14-202, 14-4101 through 14-4104 )
(   11-201, 11-504, 11-517, 11-602, 11-615, 12-105, 12-126, 12-405, 12-426, 12-906, 12-928, 2-104.1, 2-115, 2-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page