Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Currie, Madaleno, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund to be used to pay for specified reasonable and necessary administrative costs, not to exceed 5% of the specified appropriation to the MHT Grant Fund; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2018, to include an appropriation of $1,500,000 to the Fund in the annual State budget bill, subject to the limitations of the State budget; limiting to 10% of all grants awarded the amount of grants that may be awarded to historic properties owned by the Maryland Historic Trust; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1513
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {349330/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {349330/1 Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 63
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM