Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding Baltimore County to the provisions of law relating to the Cecil County, Garrett County, and St. Mary's County Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1475
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Jennings) Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Referred Senate Rules 51
Senate 3/26/2013 3/27/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM