Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Senators (By Request - Prince George's County Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Revising the composition of the Prince George's County Board of Education; providing for the appointment of specified members of the county board by the County Executive of Prince George's County and the Prince George's County Council; requiring the county board to implement specified policies; requiring the County Executive to appoint the Prince George's County Superintendent of Schools in a specified manner; establishing the responsibilities and powers of the county superintendent as the Chief Executive Officer; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Peters) Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Peters) Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1002 through 3-1004, 3-105, 3-114, 4-101, 4-109, 4-120, 4-123, 4-201 through 4-204, 4-201.1, 4-205, 4-206, 4-401 through 4-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM