Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Access to Home Health Care for Children and Adults With Medical Disabilities and Report on Home– and Community–Based Services
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Access to Home Health Care for Children and Adults with Medical Disabilities; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations for improving access to home health care in all areas of the State, including on reimbursement rates; requiring the Task Force to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by November 30, 2018; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to compare reimbursement rates and certain requirements and report its findings to the General Assembly by November 30, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1696
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {687670/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Task Force to Study Access to Home Health Care for Children and Adults With Medical Disabilities
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {687670/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Access to Home Health Care for Children and Adults With Medical Disabilities and Report on Home– and Community–Based Services
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM