Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Utilities for Operation of Restaurants
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the sales and use tax does not apply to the sale of electricity, fuel, and other utilities used to operate a restaurant.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0511 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Utilities for Operation of Restaurants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Utilities for Operation of Restaurants
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-233 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM