Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Deputy Sheriffs - Meals on Duty
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law entitling an Allegany County deputy sheriff to free meals while on duty in addition to the deputy sheriff's salary.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1493
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM