Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses in Mixed-Use Developments
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County to issue not more than five Class B beer, wine, and liquor licenses that are to be located in a single election district and used for a mixed-use development; and providing that the Act is an exception to Rule 19 of the Rules and Regulations of the Board.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-102, 13-1602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM