Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Hotels - Carbon Monoxide Alarms
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified hotels, on or after April 1, 2015, to install a specified carbon monoxide alarm inside of each guest room within the hotel; authorizing the owner of a hotel to install a specified carbon monoxide alarm within a specified distance from carbon monoxide-producing fixtures and equipment within the hotel under specified circumstances; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {534039/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable with Amendments {534039/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 4/02/2014 4/02/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1103, 12-1104, 12-1105, 12-1106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM