Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Electric Affordability Program - Study
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to study and make recommendations about the advisability of establishing an opt-in electric affordability program for residential and small business customers of specified electric companies with specified characteristics and the advisability of allowing specified electric cooperatives to participate in the program; requiring the Commission to study and make recommendations on or before December 31, 2016, to specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0927
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM