Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Cannabis – Advertising – Restrictions
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certifying provider, dispensary, processor, or grower or officers, managers, and employees of the certifying provider, dispensary, processor, or grower from cooperating, directly or indirectly, in advertising if the advertising has the purpose or effect of steering or influencing patient or caregiver choice of a certifying provider or approved medical cannabis product; prohibiting an advertisement for cannabis from containing certain statements, offers, or images; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1348
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Medical Cannabis – Advertising – Restrictions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Medical Cannabis – Advertising – Restrictions
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM