Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified conditions under which the Board of License Commissioners of Washington County may issue a specified alcoholic beverages license to the owner of a hotel or motel; requiring the hotel or motel to have specified lobby facilities, to have a ballroom, conference room, or banquet room instead of specified dining facilities; authorizing the license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor at retail at the place described under the license for on-premises consumption; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1550
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 50
House 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   31-102, 31-1903, 31-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM