Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing the Governor to transfer by budget amendment up to $50,000,000 from the Revenue Stabilization Account to fund costs associated with the Coronavirus Disease 2019 (COVID-19); requiring the Governor to provide the Legislative Policy Committee with at least 7 days for review before transferring the funds; requiring, within 60 days of the release of funds, the Department of Budget and Management to submit a report to the Legislative Policy Committee and the General Assembly on the use of the funds per unit of State government; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1661
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {399537/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2020 3/01/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator King) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator King) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {399537/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Appropriations 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Text - Chapter - State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page