Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Property Tax Exemption - Garrett College Business Incubator
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Garrett County to exempt from the county property tax specified real property in Garrett County that is owned by the Garrett College Board of Trustees and used as a specified business incubator; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1543
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 52
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-511.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM