Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
Sponsored by
Senators Astle and Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring innkeepers and hosting platform operators offering certain types of limited residential lodging to operate in a certain manner; requiring that certain records be made available to the Comptroller, the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, a law enforcement agency, a county, or a municipality; authorizing certain entities to order an innkeeper to cease and desist from offering certain lodging; providing that a hosting platform operator may not facilitate booking transactions except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Motion Re-referred Budget and Taxation (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Motion Re-referred Budget and Taxation (Senator Middleton) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-201, 15-208, 15-209 )
(   1-101, 4-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM