Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of law to exempt specified entities from the requirements of the Maryland Dentistry Act; prohibiting the State Board of Dental Examiners from requiring a person to be licensed by the Board to engage in specified activities in the State; prohibiting the Board from adopting regulations restricting specified activities; altering specified penalties; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016, July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Hearing cancelled
(   4-101, 4-102, 4-201, 4-202, 4-301, 4-601, 4-602, 4-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page