Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit Charges
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a gas company or an electric company from imposing a specified deposit requirement on customers who are at least 65 years old and have an annual income at or below 300% of the federal poverty level; prohibiting a gas company or an electric company from terminating specified service for failure to pay all or part of a deposit under specified circumstances; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1473
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit Charges
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit Charges
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-305, 7-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM