Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses - Economic Impact Analyses
Sponsored by
Senator DeGrange
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to conduct a performance audit of certain units of State government every 3 years for certain purposes; requiring certain units to make a certain determination regarding certain local regulations; requiring certain units to establish a certain electronic registry and to post on the registry a proposed regulation that has a significant small business impact; requiring certain units to create certain compliance guides to assist small businesses to comply with certain regulations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0855
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses - Economic Impact Analyses
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1001, 10-110, 10-224, 2-1220, 2-1505.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM