Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within Department
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the secretary of each principal department to be responsible for the supervision of units of State government within the jurisdiction of the secretary that are composed of individuals participating in the occupation or profession regulated by the units; requiring the secretary to adopt regulations for the supervision of those units for specified purposes; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {283024/1 Rejected
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 51
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {283024/1 Rejected 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 54
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-205, 8-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM