Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-3)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting specified individuals who apply for alcoholic beverages licenses for the use of a partnership, corporation, club, or limited liability company in Baltimore City from specified residency and registered voter requirements; and establishing specified requirements for the issuance of an alcoholic beverages license to a partnership, corporation, or club in Baltimore City.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {104233/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933891/1 Adopted
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Davis) Adopted (122-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-3)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {104233/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Economic Matters 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments {933891/1 Adopted 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Davis) Adopted (122-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (128-3) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
(   12-102, 12-1401, 12-1401.1, 12-1402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page