Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Protest of License Renewal
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners to require a specified mediation when a protest against renewing an alcoholic beverages license is filed at least 30 days before the license expires; authorizing the withdrawal or dismissal of a protest and the Board's approval or denial of a license renewal without a specified hearing if a required mediation results in a specified agreement; and requiring the Board to hold a specified hearing if a required mediation does not result in a specified agreement.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Protest of License Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Protest of License Renewal
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-1801, 12-1805, 4-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM