Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Harford County - License and Permit Fees and Repealing Obsolete Provisions
Sponsored by
Harford County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified obsolete provisions relating to alcoholic beverages in Harford County; and altering the fees for specified alcoholic beverages licenses and permits in Harford County.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0806
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-1001, 22-1002, 22-1003, 22-1004, 22-1005, 22-1006, 22-1201, 22-1301, 22-1304, 22-1309, 22-1310, 22-1311, 22-1312, 22-701, 22-801, 22-802, 22-803, 22-804, 22-805, 22-806, 22-807, 22-901, 22-902, 22-904, 22-905, 22-906, 22-907, 22-908, 22-909, 22-910 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM