Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Cousins
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the inheritance tax for property that passes to a cousin of a decedent if the decedent does not have specified surviving relatives.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Date Posted Document Name
2/23/2016 Text - First - Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Cousins
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page