Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey and Norman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Transportation Authority from making any capital investment in the John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway toll plaza; requiring the Authority to remove the John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway toll plaza when it becomes functionally obsolete and establish a new toll plaza for the John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway at a location between Maryland Route 279 and the boundary between Maryland and Delaware; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0928 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM