Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Wear, Carry, or Transport a Handgun - Expiration and Renewal
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time period in which a permit to wear, carry, or transport a handgun expires to be 5 years after the issuance; and altering the time period for renewal of a permit to wear, carry, or transport a handgun to 5 years after the last renewal.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Safety - Permit to Wear, Carry, or Transport a Handgun - Expiration and Renewal
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:45 PM