Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nursing Facilities - Quality Assessment - Modification
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the applicability of a specified quality assessment imposed by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, and specified provisions of law relating to a specified quality assessment, to nursing facilities with 70 or more beds.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1542
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 37
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-310.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM