Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, with specified exceptions, each newly issued or reissued electronic benefits transfer card to contain a photograph of the recipient; requiring the Family Investment Administration in the Department of Human Resources to establish specified procedures; prohibiting an establishment that accepts electronic benefits transfer cards from requiring a cardholder to show the photograph on the card unless other customers are required to show photographic identification; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0880 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM