Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Capital Grant Program for Public School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth
Sponsored by
Senators King, Forehand, and Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Capital Grant Program for Public School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth; requiring the Interagency Committee on Public School Construction to implement and administer the Program; specifying requirements for grants awarded under the Program; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2015, to provide $20,000,000 in the State budget for the Program each fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1532
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM