Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
3Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to convene a workgroup to evaluate and make findings and recommendations regarding the state of mental health care delivery on the Eastern Shore of Maryland; requiring the workgroup to include specified individuals; requiring the Department to report the findings and recommendations of the workgroup to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1144
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0972 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {277170/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Favorable with Amendments {277170/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM