Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Regional Development Councils
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, and Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law granting the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland and the Tri-County Council for Western Maryland immunity from suit; altering the definition of a "local government" under the Local Government Tort Claims Act to include specified regional development councils; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {722611/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senators Brochin, Cassilly, and Muse
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Delegates Moon, Morales, and Sanchez
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {722611/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 66A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senators Brochin, Cassilly, and Muse 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 House Refuses to Recede 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Delegates Moon, Morales, and Sanchez 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 71
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 71
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-505, 5-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM