Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a specified services agreement between a credit card processor and a business entity from including a specified provision authorizing liquidated damages or specifying a fee for the termination of a services agreement that exceeds $99; prohibiting a credit card processor who has received a specified termination notice from debiting or accessing the bank account of a specified business entity after a specified period of time; authorizing the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to take specified actions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1400
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   12-1401 through 12-1404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page