Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Paid Rescue Squad Members and Paid Advanced Life Support Unit Members
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Miller, Middleton, Astle, Feldman, Glassman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the presumption of compensability under the workers' compensation law to include, under specified conditions, paid rescue squad and advanced life support unit members who experience heart disease, hypertension, or lung disease resulting in partial or total disability or death; extending the presumption of compensability under the workers' compensation law to include, under specified conditions, paid rescue squad and advanced life support unit members who experience specified cancers under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {237175/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-17)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable with Amendments {237175/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (37-9) 57
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/02/2014 4/02/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/02/2014 4/02/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (118-17) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM