Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Watkins Mill Road Interchange Project
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Kagan, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Raskin, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to undertake all steps necessary to complete the Watkins Mill Road Interchange Project; specifying specified requirements for the Project; requiring the Governor to appropriate a specified amount of funding for the Project; stating the intent of the General Assembly; requiring the Administration to submit, on or before December 1 of each year, a report on the status of the Watkins Mill project to specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1562
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-14)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (30-14) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 52
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM