Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Procedures and Credentialing Practices
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering from 30 to 15 days the time period after a certain date within which a carrier is required to send a certain notice; altering from 120 to 60 days the time period after a certain date within which a carrier is required to make a certain decision and send a certain notice under certain circumstances; and prohibiting a carrier from imposing a limit on the number of providers at a health care facility that may be credentialed to participate on a certain provider panel.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1310
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Procedures and Credentialing Practices
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM