Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Ramirez, Mathias, and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating, beginning in calendar year 2016, the last 7 days of August through the first 7 days of September of each year to be tax-free periods during which an exemption from the sales and use tax is provided for the sale of specified textbooks purchased by specified individuals; designating, beginning in calendar year 2017, an additional tax-free period during the last 14 days of January for return-to-school textbook shopping in Maryland; and defining a specified term.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0665 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-232 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM