Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Governance - Medical Center Employees
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Ramirez, Astle, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Directors of the University of Maryland Medical System Corporation to establish a nonprofit subsidiary to operate all or a part of the University of Maryland Medical Center in order to bring specified Medical Center employees within the jurisdiction of the National Labor Relations Act; honoring collective bargaining agreements subject to specified terms and requirements; providing that individuals who have elected to be exclusively represented maintain specified representation under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1545
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {767973/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864969/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-41)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-8)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Referred Senate Rules 41
Senate 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {767973/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Appropriations 51
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {864969/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-41) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (39-8) 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-302, 13-303, 13-304, 13-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM