Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Astle, Cassilly, DeGrange, Jennings, Norman, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program in the circuit courts for Anne Arundel County and Harford County to determine whether to establish a structured, defined, and systematic approach for providing a courthouse dog to a child witness in any circuit court proceeding in the State; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to develop a plan to implement the pilot program; requiring the Administrative Office to establish procedures for requesting a specified dog and handler to assist a child witness; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {428974/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {428974/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM