Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sterile Compounding Permits - Definition of "Compounding", Study, and Recommendations
Sponsored by
Senators Conway and Dyson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "compounding" for purposes of provisions of law governing sterile compounding to exclude mixing, reconstituting, or similar acts routinely performed by or under the supervision of an oncologist, a rheumatologist, or hematologist who administers chemotherapy, biologic therapy, supportive care medication, rheumatology therapy, or any other therapy in the treatment of cancer, a rheumatology condition, or a blood condition and in accordance with specified directions and guidance; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744033/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {983720/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {866788/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Conway) Adopted 41A
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Referred Senate Rules 41A
Senate 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {744033/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {983720/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 51
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {866788/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM