Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreclosures - Dorchester County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring Dorchester County to issue a certificate of vacancy or a certificate of property unfit for human habitation under specified circumstances; and requiring a certificate of vacancy or a certificate of property unfit for human habitation to be issued or denied in Dorchester County within 14 days after the request for the certificate.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Foreclosures - Dorchester County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM