Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program and Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program; establishing the purpose of the Program is to foster job creation and economic development in the State in a specified manner; requiring the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to administer the Program; authorizing a specified small business to apply to the Corporation for a grant under the Program to reimburse specified costs and to match specified funding awards; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1628
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-4A-01 through 10-4A-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM