Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Transfer of License
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh and Conway
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the transfer of specified Class B-D-7 alcoholic beverages licenses from specified blocks in Baltimore City to other blocks in Baltimore City.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1554
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jones-Rodwell) {213328/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Pugh) Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Referred Senate Rules 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Jones-Rodwell) {213328/1 Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM