Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BWLT Tasting Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding Ward 25, precinct 4 of the 44th Legislative District in Baltimore City to the list of areas in which the Board of Liquor License Commissioners may issue a Class BWLT beer, wine, and liquor tasting license to a holder of a Class A beer, wine and liquor license.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 59
Senate 4/03/2014 4/03/2014 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM