Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage Prevention
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Human Services to use certain unexpended funds to establish a certain arrearage prevention program; providing that the purpose and intent of the program is a one-time grant of money to establish ongoing arrearage prevention activities in the State; providing for the Department to select certain program recipients for certain purposes; requiring the Department, for fiscal year 2019, to dedicate $750,000 of unexpended funds in the Electric Universal Service Program to the arrearage prevention program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1528
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage Prevention
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage Prevention
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {603598/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-18)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage Prevention
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage Prevention
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage Prevention
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage Prevention
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable with Amendments {603598/1 Adopted 52A
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52A
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (116-18) 53
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage Prevention
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697
Text - Chapter - Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage Prevention
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM