Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe (By Request - Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds) and Senators Benson and Madaleno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Treasurer to invest or reinvest specified funds in a specified obligation issued and unconditionally guaranteed by a supranational issuer; defining a specified term; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1570
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Appropriations 52
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM