Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to include in a specified report specified statistics related to inmate employment and wages at specified facilities; requiring the Division of Correction to include in a report regarding Maryland Correctional Enterprises specified statistics regarding inmate employment and wages; establishing the Task Force on Inmate Labor to analyze specified hurdles to greater inmate compensation, to track specified outcomes of inmate employment, and to survey specified employed inmates; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017, October 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-207, 3-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM