Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional Amendment
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kasemeyer, King, McFadden, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, Middleton, Muse, Hershey, Simonaire, Robinson, Kelley, Pinsky, Lee, Klausmeier, Kagan, Feldman, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 357
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to limit the uses of certain revenues to educational opportunities and programs for the children of the State in public schools, the advancement of educators, and the construction of school facilities; requiring the Governor to include in the budget submission certain amounts in certain fiscal years as supplemental funding for certain purposes; requiring that certain funding be in addition to certain State funding provided for certain grades in public schools; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1697
Bill File Type: Regular
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional Amendment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {869430/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {713425/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {263226/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (16-29)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional Amendment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations Ways and Means
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {253225/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-82)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-2)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 357
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional Amendment
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {869430/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Floor Amendment {713425/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Floor Amendment {263226/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (16-29) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional Amendment
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Appropriations Ways and Means 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Floor Amendment {253225/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-82) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (130-2) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 357
Text - Chapter - Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional Amendment
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page