Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Raskin, and Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing an exception to a requirement that a driver overtake and pass a bicycle, an EPAMD, or a motor scooter in a specified manner that applies when a highway lacks sufficient width; requiring a driver who passes a bicycle, an EPAMD, or a motor scooter in accordance with a specified provision of law to pass at a reasonable or prudent speed that is safe for existing weather, road, and vehicular or pedestrian traffic conditions and does not endanger, impede, or interfere with the bicycle, EPAMD, motor scooter, or other traffic; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0214
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2016 2/25/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM